GA SB1 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 33 and Title 19 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating respectively to insurance and domestic relations, so as to provide that both parents shall have equal access to the child's health insurance information and records; to provide for exceptions; to provide for parenting plans to include that both parents have access to health insurance information and records; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Child's Health Insurance Information and Records; provide that both parents have equal access
Sponsors
Sen. William Ligon [R] | Sen. Joshua McKoon [R] | Sen. David Shafer [R] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] |
Sen. John Albers [R] | Rep. Alex Atwood [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-22 - House - House Vote #334 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #108 (Y: 49 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #108 (Y: 49 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2013-05-06 | Act 171 | |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2013-03-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-03-14 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-03-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-03-07 | House | House First Readers |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Senate Hopper |