GA SB1 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-09 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-09 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 5 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding ad valorem taxation of property, so as to prohibit local governments from conducting public hearings regarding the increase of millage rates in excess of the roll-back rate on the same day as other local governments are conducting public hearings which affect all or a portion of the same properties subject to such increase in millage rates; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Ad Valorem; prohibit local govt. on increasing millage rates the same day as other local govt. which affect all/portion of same properties subject to increase.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate Vote #12 - Morning Roll Call (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #10 - Veto Override 2010 Veto # 20 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #10 - Veto Override 2010 Veto # 20 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-09 | Senate Recommitted | |
2011-02-22 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2011-02-17 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-02-07 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2010-12-06 | Senate Prefile |