GA HR870 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION urging the Capitol Arts Standards Commission to arrange for placement of a suitable portrait of former Speaker Pro Tempore Jack Connell in an appropriate location in the state capitol; and for other purposes.
Title
Capitol Arts Standards Commission; arrange placement of portrait of former Speaker Pro Tempore Jack Connell in state capitol; urge
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - House - House Vote #856 (Y: 168 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-03-20 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-02-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-03-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-03-26 | House | House First Readers |
2013-03-25 | House | House Hopper |