GA HR610 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION urging the United States Congress to remove election and voting systems from the critical infrastructure designation; and for other purposes.
Title
United States Congress; remove election and voting systems from the critical infrastructure designation; urge
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Spencer [R] | Rep. Buzz Brockway [R] | Rep. Susan Holmes [R] | Rep. Tom Kirby [R] |
Sen. Ed Setzler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-03-16 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-03-15 | House | House First Readers |
2017-03-14 | House | House Hopper |