GA HR52 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION encouraging all schools, local educational agencies, and the state educational agency to recognize that dyslexia has a profound educational impact that must be addressed; and for other purposes.
Title
Education; all schools, local educational agencies and state educational agency to recognize that dyslexia has a profound educational impact that must be addressed; encourage
Sponsors
Rep. John Corbett [R] | Rep. Steven Sainz [R] | Rep. Jason Ridley [R] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] |
Rep. John LaHood [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - House - House Vote #277 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-25 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-01-30 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-01-29 | House | House First Readers |
2019-01-28 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/54344 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/179792 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/54344#16951 |