GA HR421 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-21 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-21 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the Joint Study Committee on Infant and Toddler Social and Emotional Health; and for other purposes.
Title
Joint Study Committee on Infant and Toddler Social and Emotional Health; create
Sponsors
Rep. Katie Dempsey [R] | Rep. Jan Jones [R] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. Mary Oliver [D] |
Rep. Robert Dickey [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - House - House Vote #264 (Y: 158 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-21 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-13 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-03-07 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-05 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-04 | House | House Hopper |