GA HR405 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Georgia so as to provide for the election of members of the State Board of Education; to provide for related matters; to provide for the submission of this amendment for ratification or rejection; and for other purposes.
Title
State Board of Education; election of members; provide - CA
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Teasley [R] | Rep. David Casas [R] | Rep. Wesley Cantrell [R] | Rep. Buzz Brockway [R] |
Sen. Ed Setzler [R] | Rep. Valencia Stovall [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2017-02-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-24 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-23 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/50996 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20172018/166532 |