GA HR388 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-23 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-23 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the House Study Committee on Meeting the Demand for Nursing Care in Georgia; and for other purposes.
Title
House Study Committee on Meeting the Demand for Nursing Care in Georgia; create
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Kirby [R] | Rep. Jodi Lott [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-23 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-22 | House | House Hopper |