GA HR346 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION honoring the lives of Caitlyn Baggett, Morgan Bass, Emily Clark, Abbie Deloach, and Catherine McKay Pittman and dedicating a bridge in their memory; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Southern Nursing Angels Memorial Bridge; Bryan County; dedicate
Sponsors
Rep. Jan Tankersley [R] | Rep. John Carson [R] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. Jon Burns [R] |
Rep. Butch Parrish [R] | Sen. Brandon Beach [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #391 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #341 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Vote #151 (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #341 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Vote #151 (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-06 | Act 212 | |
2019-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-12 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-04-02 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-05 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-05 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-04 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-26 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-25 | House | House Hopper |