GA HR282 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Effective Date 2021-04-29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Effective Date 2021-04-29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION honoring the life and memory of Ms. Sydnie Grace Jones and dedicating an intersection in her memory; and for other purposes.
Title
Sydnie Grace Jones Memorial Intersection; dedicate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Senate - Adoption: Senate Vote #281 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Adopt: House Vote #192 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Adopt: House Vote #192 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Effective Date 2021-04-29 | |
2021-04-29 | Act 42 | |
2021-04-29 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-05 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-08 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-08 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-03 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-01 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-01 | House | House Hopper |