GA HR240 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION creating the Joint Study Committee on Reforming HIV Related Criminal Laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint Study Committee on Reforming HIV Related Criminal Laws; create

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-30 - House - House Vote #386 (Y: 170 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-30HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-30HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-15HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-14HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-10HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback