GA HR18 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION compensating Mr. Jakeith Bendray Robinson, Sr.; and for other purposes.
Title
Robinson, Mr. Jakeith Bendray, Sr.; compensate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #631 (Y: 128 N: 26 NV: 8 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-12 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-03-12 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-01-28 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-01-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-01-16 | House | House First Readers |
2019-01-15 | House | House Hopper |