GA HR1397 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION encouraging the Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration (FMCSA) to withdraw the Electronic Logging Device (ELD) regulations on the agriculture industry and supporting agribusinesses; and for other purposes.
Title
Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration (FMCSA); withdraw the Electronic Logging Device regulation on the agriculture industry; encourage
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Dickey [R] | Rep. Tom McCall [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] | Sen. Sam Watson [R] |
Rep. Chad Nimmer [R] | Rep. John Corbett [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - House - House Vote #765 (Y: 162 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-03-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-03-15 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2018-03-07 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-03-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-03-01 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-28 | House | House Hopper |