GA HR1290 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A RESOLUTION recognizing February 12, 2010, as Hungary Day at the state capitol and inviting Ambassador of Hungary Béla Szombati to be recognized by the House of Representatives; and for other purposes.
Title
Hungary Day; Feb. 12, 2010; recognize and invite ambassador to House
Sponsors
Rep. Jan Jones [R] | Rep. Jerry Keen [R] | Rep. Greg Morris [R] | Rep. Butch Parrish [R] |
Rep. David Ralston [R] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-11 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-02-11 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-02-03 | House Read and Referred |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/29584 |
Text | http://www1.legis.ga.gov/legis/2009_10/versions/hr1290_LC_94_1993_a_2.htm |