GA HR1103 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION urging the Biden Administration to remove its veto and reapprove Georgia's Medicaid expansion waiver; and for other purposes.
Title
Biden Administration; remove its veto and reapprove Georgia's Medicaid expansion waiver; urge
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Newton [R] | Rep. Jan Jones [R] | Rep. Jodi Lott [R] | Rep. Jon Burns [R] |
Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. Josh Bonner [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - House - Adopt: House Vote #862 (Y: 97 N: 73 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-04-04 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-29 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-29 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-03-28 | House | House First Readers |
2022-03-25 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/63082 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/210428 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/63082#19815 |