GA HR1089 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION urging the United States Congress to pass the federal "Marketplace Fairness Act" in support of equity and sales tax fairness; and for other purposes.
Title
United States Congress; pass the federal Marketplace Fairness Act; urge
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Powell [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] | Rep. Brett Harrell [R] | Rep. Shaw Blackmon [R] |
Rep. Trey Kelley [R] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - House - House Vote #681 (Y: 150 N: 11 NV: 10 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-13 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-12 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-08 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/52651 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20172018/172856 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/52651#15968 |