GA HR1019 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION supporting increased protections for America's borders; and for other purposes.
Title
America's borders; support increased protections
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Sainz [R] | Rep. Rick Jasperse [R] | Rep. Jordan Ridley [R] | Rep. Kimberly New [R] |
Rep. Mitchell Horner [R] | Rep. Jesse Petrea [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-13 - House - Adopt: House Vote #471 (Y: 98 N: 71 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-02-13 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-12 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-08 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-07 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/66766 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/223160 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/66766#22885 |