GA HB987 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 31 of the O.C.G.A., relating to health, so as to provide additional measures for the protection of elderly persons; to increase the maximum fines for violation by health care facilities; to provide for staffing, training, and financial stability requirements for certain personal care homes and assisted living communities; to provide for limited nursing services in assisted living communities; to provide for certification of memory care centers; to provide for definitions; to amend Title 43 of the O.C.G.A., relating to professions and businesses, so as to provide for definitions; to rename the State Board of Nursing Home Administrators the State Board of Long-Term Care Facility Administrators; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health; additional measures for the protection of elderly persons; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-24 - House - House Vote #727 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 34) [PASS]
2020-06-19 - Senate - Senate Vote #662 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House Vote #493 (Y: 160 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30 Effective Date
2020-06-30 Act 403
2020-06-30HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2020-06-26HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2020-06-24HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2020-06-19SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2020-06-19SenateSenate Third Read
2020-06-18SenateSenate Read Second Time
2020-06-17SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-03-02SenateSenate Read and Referred
2020-02-28HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2020-02-28HouseHouse Third Readers
2020-02-26HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-02-25HouseHouse Second Readers
2020-02-24HouseHouse First Readers
2020-02-21HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback