GA HB982 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 7 of the O.C.G.A., relating to financial institutions, so as to repeal Article 4, relating to the sale of checks or money orders, and Article 4A, relating to the cashing of checks, drafts, or money orders for consideration, and to enact new Articles 4 and 4A; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Financial institutions; repeal Articles 4 and 4A; enact new Articles 4 and 4A; provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate Vote #633 (Y: 53 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Vote #694 (Y: 172 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Vote #694 (Y: 172 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-15 | Act 532 | |
2014-04-15 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-25 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-03-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-02-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-02-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-02-11 | House | House First Readers |
2014-02-10 | House | House Hopper |