GA HB975 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 10 of Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to assets and liabilities, so as to provide for certain updates to the standard valuation law as it relates to the reserve requirements for companies allowed to opt out of the principal based reserves standards; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Commerce and trade; assets and liabilities; provide certain updates to the standard valuation law
Sponsors
Rep. James Shaw [R] | Rep. Richard Smith [R] | Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] | Rep. Johnnie Caldwell [R] |
Rep. Shaw Blackmon [R] | Rep. Mike Cheokas [R] | Sen. Larry Walker [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-23 - House - House Vote #586 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2016-02-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-17 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-16 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-11 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-10 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/48286 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20152016/157069 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/48286#14032 |