GA HB968 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 3 of Title 9 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to limitations on recovery for deficiencies connected with improvements to realty and resulting injuries, so as to clarify actions that may be brought pursuant to Code Section 9-3-51 regarding deficiencies in connection with improvements to realty; to provide for related matters; to provide for applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Civil practice; clarify actions that may be brought pursuant to Code Section 9-3-51 regarding deficiencies in connection with improvements to realty
Sponsors
Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] | Rep. Barry Fleming [R] | Rep. Jon Burns [R] | Rep. Bruce Williamson [R] |
Rep. James Hatchett [R] | Rep. Shaw Blackmon [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - House - House Vote #508 (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-02 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-03-02 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-02-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-21 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-20 | House | House Hopper |