GA HB963 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-23 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-23 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 3 of Article 6 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to educational programs under the "Quality Basic Education Act," so as to provide for the annual development of a promoted list of industry credentials and state licenses that meet certain high-demand or high-wage criteria; to provide for distribution of the annual promoted list; to provide for annual reporting; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Quality Basic Education Act; annual development of promoted list of industry credentials that meet certain high-demand criteria; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Buzz Brockway [R] | Rep. Brett Harrell [R] | Rep. Scott Holcomb [D] | Rep. Al Williams [D] |
Rep. David Clark [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-21 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-20 | House | House Hopper |