GA HB960 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 48 of the O.C.G.A., relating to state administration and collection of revenue, so as to provide for confidentiality of certain tax information; to provide for an interest rate on delinquent payments that adjusts to reflect changes in the prime rate; to adjust the penalties for nonpayment of ad valorem taxes to offset the reduction in interest rate; to make distribution of penalties equitable between taxing jurisdictions; to provide for additional procedures, conditions, and limitations; to provide for notice to political subdivisions upon the filing of certain tax refund requests; to provide for confidentiality of taxpayer information; to provide for automatic transfer to the Georgia Tax Tribunal in certain cases; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Tax and revenue; confidentiality of certain tax information; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Trey Kelley [R] | Rep. Barbara Sims [R] | Rep. Katie Dempsey [R] | Rep. Brett Harrell [R] |
Rep. Penny Houston [R] | Rep. Jay Powell [R] | Sen. David Shafer [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #725 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - House Vote #891 (Y: 142 N: 19 NV: 15 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #816 (Y: 47 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #682 (Y: 40 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House Vote #698 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - House Vote #891 (Y: 142 N: 19 NV: 15 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #816 (Y: 47 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #682 (Y: 40 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House Vote #698 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-27 | Act 488 | |
2016-04-27 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-04-05 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2016-03-24 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-02-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-10 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-09 | House | House Hopper |