GA HB953 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1 of Article 3 of Chapter 5 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the general authority, duties, and procedure of state purchasing, so as to provide that certain terms in particular types of state contracts shall be void and unenforceable and should not be included in such agreements; to require the Department of Administrative Services to provide such information on its website; to specify that bids, offers, or proposals and registers thereof shall be subject to the public disclosure provisions of Article 4 of Chapter 18 of Title 50, relating to open records; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Administrative Services, Department of; certain terms in particular types of state contracts shall be void and unenforceable and should not be included in such agreements; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #623 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-13SenateSenate Read and Referred
2020-03-12HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2020-03-12HouseHouse Third Readers
2020-03-05HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2020-02-21HouseHouse Second Readers
2020-02-20HouseHouse First Readers
2020-02-19HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback