GA HB950 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-23 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-23 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 27-3-15 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to hunting seasons and bag limits, promulgation of rules and regulations by board, possession of more than the bag limit, and reporting number of deer killed; to modify seasons and bag limits for deer, opossum, and raccoon; to remove formal report requirement; to authorize the Department of Natural Resources to implement a deer management assistance program; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Game and fish; modify seasons and bag limits for deer, opossum, and raccoon; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. James Shaw [R] | Rep. John Corbett [R] | Sen. Sam Watson [R] | Rep. Chad Nimmer [R] |
Rep. Al Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-20 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-15 | House | House Hopper |