GA HB946 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act relating to the Board of Education of Houston County, approved March 31, 1994 (Ga. L. 1994, p. 4435), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 16, 1999 (Ga. L. 1999, p. 4640), so as to modify the compensation of the members of the Board of Education of Houston County; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Houston County; Board of Education; modify compensation of members
Sponsors
Rep. Heath Clark [R] | Rep. Shaw Blackmon [R] | Rep. James Epps [R] | Rep. Buddy Harden [R] |
Rep. Robert Dickey [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #662 (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #625 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #625 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | Effective Date | |
2018-05-03 | Act 397 | |
2018-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-02-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-23 | House | House Postponed |
2018-02-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-20 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-15 | House | House Hopper |