GA HB946 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-21 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-21 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 13 of Chapter 1 of Title 7 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the licensing of mortgage lenders and brokers, so as to prohibit certain mortgage activities without a license; to provide for qualifications for the issuance of a mortgage loan originator license; to provide for the power of the department to revoke or decline to issue a license or registration in certain instances; to provide for the prohibition of certain conduct by persons engaged in mortgage activities; to provide for a grace period for serving residential mortgages with an inactive license or registration; to provide for certain criminal penalties; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Mortgage lenders and brokers; certain mortgage activities without a license; prohibit
Sponsors
Rep. John Carson [R] | Rep. Dee Dawkins-Haigler [D] | Rep. Delvis Dutton [R] | Rep. Greg Morris [R] |
Sen. Jack Murphy [R] | Rep. Sam Teasley [R] | Rep. Bruce Williamson [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-07 - House - House Vote #667 - Passage (Y: 167 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-21 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-03-20 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-03-07 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-07 | House Third Readers | |
2012-02-23 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-15 | House Second Readers | |
2012-02-09 | House First Readers |