GA HB941 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-28 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-28 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 5 of Title 16, Article 1 of Chapter 15 of Title 45, and Article 7 of Chapter 4 of Title 49 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to kidnapping, false imprisonment, and related offenses, general provisions regarding the Attorney General, and medical assistance generally, respectively, so as to provide for authority of the Attorney General to investigate and prosecute certain crimes and offenses; to provide for definitions; to provide for authority of the Attorney General to employ peace officers for certain purposes; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Attorney General; investigate and prosecute certain crimes and offenses; provide for the authority
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-20 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-19 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-18 | House | House Hopper |