GA HB936 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 7 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the imposition, rate, computation, and exemptions from income taxes, so as to clarify certain terms in respect to the wages necessary to qualify for a jobs tax credit; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Income tax; wages necessary to qualify for a jobs tax credit; clarify certain terms
Sponsors
Rep. Brett Harrell [R] | Rep. Jay Powell [R] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Rep. David Knight [R] |
Rep. Geoff Duncan [R] | Rep. Bruce Williamson [R] | Sen. Hunter Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #824 (Y: 45 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #723 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - House Vote #892 (Y: 158 N: 7 NV: 11 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #682 (Y: 40 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House Vote #670 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #723 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - House Vote #892 (Y: 158 N: 7 NV: 11 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #682 (Y: 40 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House Vote #670 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-27 | Act 480 | |
2016-04-27 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-04-05 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2016-03-24 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2016-02-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-17 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-09 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-08 | House | House Hopper |