GA HB930 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to repeal an Act providing for a supplemental expense allowance for the judges of the superior courts of each judicial circuit within this state having a population of not less than 103,000 and not more than 135,000 according to the United States decennial census of 1970 or any future such census, approved March 23, 1977 (Ga. L. 1977, p. 727), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 15, 1992 (Ga. L. 1992, p. 1680); to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Judicial circuits; superior court judge for certain populations; repeal supplemental expense allowance
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Dickey [R] | Rep. Buddy Harden [R] | Rep. Chad Nimmer [R] | Rep. Larry O'Neal [R] |
Rep. Chuck Sims [R] | Rep. Tommy Smith [R] | Sen. Ross Tolleson [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #849 - Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House Vote #505 - Passage (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House Vote #505 - Passage (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-05-01 | Act 682 | |
2012-05-01 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-03 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Taken from Table | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Tabled | |
2012-03-21 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-03-21 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-22 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-02-21 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-21 | House Third Readers | |
2012-02-15 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-09 | House Second Readers | |
2012-02-08 | House First Readers |