GA HB93 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 74 of Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to local government code enforcement boards created on or after January 1, 2003, so as to change a definition for purposes of said article; to change certain references to "code inspectors" to "code enforcement officers" in said article; to amend Code Section 41-2-7 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to power of counties and municipalities to repair, close, or demolish unfit buildings or structures, health hazards on private property, and properties affected, so as to provide for findings by code enforcement officers; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Code enforcement boards; code enforcement officers; change definition
Sponsors
Sen. John Albers [R] | Rep. Hank Huckaby [R] | Rep. Mike Jacobs [R] | Rep. Edward Lindsey [R] |
Sen. Elena Parent [D] | Rep. Lynne Riley [R] | Rep. Tom Taylor [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #657 - Passage (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - House Vote #69 - Passage (Y: 148 N: 21 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - House Vote #69 - Passage (Y: 148 N: 21 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-04-16 | Act 596 | |
2012-04-16 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-02 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-21 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-21 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-02-01 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-01-09 | Senate Recommitted | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2011-03-22 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-01 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2011-02-28 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2011-02-28 | House Third Readers | |
2011-02-17 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-02-01 | House Second Readers | |
2011-01-31 | House First Readers |