GA HB921 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to incorporate the City of South Fulton in Fulton County, Georgia, approved April 26, 2016 (Ga. L. 2016, p. 3726), as amended, so as to revise provisions regarding the city attorney; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
South Fulton, City of; revise provisions regarding city attorney
Sponsors
Rep. Roger Bruce [D] | Rep. Debra Bazemore [D] | Rep. Derrick Jackson [D] | Rep. William Boddie [D] |
Rep. Marie Metze [D] | Rep. Sharon Beasley-Teague [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #535 (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Vote #471 (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Vote #471 (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Effective Date | |
2020-06-29 | Act 330 | |
2020-06-29 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-24 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-21 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-02-21 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-02-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-20 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-19 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-18 | House | House Hopper |