GA HB912 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 5 of Title 49 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to programs and protection for children and youth, so as to authorize foster parents to arrange for short-term babysitting; to provide for definitions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Social services; authorize foster parents to arrange for short-term babysitting

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #606 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-13SenateSenate Read and Referred
2020-03-12HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2020-03-12HouseHouse Third Readers
2020-03-05HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2020-02-19HouseHouse Second Readers
2020-02-18HouseHouse First Readers
2020-02-05HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback