GA HB911 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Effective Date 2022-05-12
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Effective Date 2022-05-12
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to make and provide appropriations for the State Fiscal Year beginning July 1, 2022, and ending June 30, 2023; to make and provide such appropriations for the operation of the state government and its departments, boards, bureaus, commissions, institutions, and other agencies, for the university system, common schools, counties, municipalities, and political subdivisions, for all other governmental activities, projects, and undertakings authorized by law, and for all leases, contracts, agreements, and grants authorized by law; to provide for the control and administration of funds; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
General appropriations; State Fiscal Year July 1, 2022 - June 30, 2023
Sponsors
Rep. David Ralston [R] | Rep. Jan Jones [R] | Rep. Jon Burns [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] |
Sen. Blake Tillery [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - House - Adopt Ccr: House Vote #898 (Y: 160 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Adopt Conference Committee Report: Senate Vote #833 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-25 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #713 (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - Passage: House Vote #670 (Y: 155 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Adopt Conference Committee Report: Senate Vote #833 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-25 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #713 (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - Passage: House Vote #670 (Y: 155 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Effective Date 2022-05-12 | |
2022-05-12 | Act 865 | |
2022-05-12 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-07 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-04-04 | House | House Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Appointed 30th, 49th, 19th |
2022-03-28 | House | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate |
2022-03-28 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed 116th, 159th, 47th |
2022-03-28 | House | House Insisted |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Insisted |
2022-03-28 | House | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate |
2022-03-28 | House | House Disagreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-11 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-03-11 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-01-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-01-14 | House | House First Readers |
2022-01-13 | House | House Hopper |