GA HB911 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 6 of Title 16, Article 2 of Chapter 3 of Title 35, Article 3 of Chapter 5 of Title 42, and Article 1 of Chapter 2 of Title 49 of the O.C.G.A., relating to sexual offenses, the Georgia Crime Information Center, conditions of detention generally, and general provisions regarding the Department of Human Services, respectively, so as to provide for the offenses of improper sexual conduct by a foster parent in the first and second degrees; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Crimes and offenses; offenses of improper sexual conduct by a foster parent in the first and second degrees; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Setzler [R] | Rep. Jodi Lott [R] | Rep. Charles Martin [R] | Rep. Michael Caldwell [R] |
Rep. Matt Dollar [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #773 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House Vote #542 (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House Vote #542 (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2020-07-21 | Act 480 | |
2020-07-21 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-07-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-06-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-09 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-03-09 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-02-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-19 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-18 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-05 | House | House Hopper |