GA HB911 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to provide a new charter for the City of Griffin, approved May 17, 2004 (Ga. L. 2004, p. 4232), as amended, so as to provide for a mayor and a mayor pro tem; to provide for the duties and powers of the mayor and mayor pro tem; to provide for the election and qualifications of the mayor and how to fill vacancies in the office of mayor; to provide for quorums; to provide for procedures; to provide for related matters; to provide for a referendum and contingent effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Griffin, City of; provide for mayor and mayor pro tem
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #603 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #625 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #625 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Effective Date | |
2018-03-20 | Act 288 | |
2018-03-20 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-03-19 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-02-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-23 | House | House Postponed |
2018-02-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-13 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-12 | House | House Hopper |