GA HB911 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 5 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to assault and battery, so as to add provisions regarding strangulation as an aggravated assault; to amend Chapter 11 of Title 15 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to juvenile proceedings, so as to fix cross-references; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Crimes and offenses; strangulation as aggravated assault; add provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Mandi Ballinger [R] | Rep. Rich Golick [R] | Rep. Mary Oliver [D] | Rep. B.J. Pak [R] |
Rep. Regina Quick [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #598 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House Vote #538 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House Vote #538 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-22 | Act 576 | |
2014-04-22 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-25 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-02-20 | House | House Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2014-02-20 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-02-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-02-06 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-02-05 | House | House First Readers |
2014-02-04 | House | House Hopper |