GA HB911 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-26 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-26 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 5 of Title 21 and Chapter 2 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, related to ethics in government and the state administrative organization, administration, and enforcement for revenue and taxation, respectively, so as to provide for investigation and enforcement of the constitutional requirement for public officers to file and pay federal, state, and local taxes; to provide for related matters; to provide for a contingent effective date; to provide for automatic repeal under certain circumstances; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Ethics; public officers; requirement to file and pay taxes; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Hill [R] | Rep. Jerry Keen [R] | Rep. Edward Lindsey [R] | Rep. DuBose Porter [D] |
Rep. Tom Rice [R] | Rep. Donna Sheldon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-26 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-02-17 | House Second Readers | |
2010-02-16 | House First Readers | |
2010-01-08 | House Prefiled |