GA HB90 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-13 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-13 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 2 of Article 3 of Chapter 3 of Title 12 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Heritage Trust Program, so as to authorize the State of Georgia to transfer its interests in heritage preserve properties to a county or local government upon certain conditions; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Heritage Trust Program; transfer State properties to local government; authorize
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-14 - House - House Vote #346 - Agree Sen Sub (Y: 166 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #310 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Vote #51 - Passage (Y: 162 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #310 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Vote #51 - Passage (Y: 162 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-13 | Effective Date | |
2011-05-13 | Act 232 | |
2011-05-13 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2011-04-21 | House Sent to Governor | |
2011-04-14 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2011-04-12 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2011-04-12 | Senate Third Read | |
2011-03-28 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-02-24 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2011-02-23 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2011-02-23 | House Third Readers | |
2011-02-16 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-02-01 | House Second Readers | |
2011-01-31 | House First Readers |