GA HB886 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 8 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to state sales and use taxes, so as to provide for the cooperation of the Department of Revenue and the Department of Agriculture in the administration and enforcement of the state sales and use tax exemption for agricultural machinery and equipment; to provide for a change to the qualifying amounts for the agricultural exemption; to provide for penalties; to provide for reporting; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Sales and use tax; exemption for agricultural machinery and equipment; provisions
Sponsors
Sen. Sam Watson [R] | Rep. Jay Powell [R] | Rep. Tom McCall [R] | Rep. Robert Dickey [R] |
Rep. Clay Pirkle [R] | Rep. Dominic Lariccia [R] | Sen. John Wilkinson [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #653 (Y: 46 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Vote #567 (Y: 165 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Vote #567 (Y: 165 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Effective Date | |
2018-05-03 | Act 387 | |
2018-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-13 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-12 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-08 | House | House Hopper |