GA HB886 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 7-1-285 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to limits on obligations of one person or corporation, so as to limit certain obligations related to credit exposure as a counterparty in derivative transactions; to provide for definitions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Banking and finance; credit exposure as a counterparty in derivative transactions; limit certain obligations
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Battles [R] | Rep. John Carson [R] | Sen. Greg Goggans [R] | Rep. Michael Harden [R] |
Rep. Calvin Smyre [D] | Rep. Charles Williams [R] | Rep. Bruce Williamson [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #633 - Passage (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House Vote #511 - Passage (Y: 165 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House Vote #511 - Passage (Y: 165 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-04-19 | Act 615 | |
2012-04-19 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-03 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-14 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-14 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-02-28 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-22 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-02-21 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-21 | House Third Readers | |
2012-02-07 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-06 | House Second Readers | |
2012-02-03 | House First Readers |