GA HB883 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-14 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 50-14-1 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to meetings open to the public, limitation on action to contest agency action, recording, notice of time and place, access to minutes, and teleconferences, so as to authorize county boards of health to conduct meetings via teleconference; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State government; county boards of health to conduct meetings via teleconference; authorize

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-07 - House - Passage: House Vote #437 (Y: 162 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-14SenateSenate Read Second Time
2024-03-13SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2024-02-08SenateSenate Read and Referred
2024-02-07HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2024-02-07HouseHouse Third Readers
2024-01-25HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2024-01-11HouseHouse Second Readers
2024-01-10HouseHouse First Readers
2024-01-09HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback