GA HB881 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-04 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-04 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 8 of Title 19 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to adoption, so as to substantially revise the general provisions applicable to adoptions; to change the requirements for adopting children; to provide for adoption of foreign-born children; to provide for a waiver to withdraw a surrender of rights; to change the age for individuals to access the Adoption Reunion Registry; to revise and provide for forms; to provide for the annulment of an adoption under certain circumstances; to amend Code Section 15-11-320 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to termination of parental rights, so as to correct a cross-reference; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Domestic relations; adoption; substantially revise general provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Albert Reeves [R] | Rep. Barry Fleming [R] | Rep. Trey Kelley [R] | Rep. Mary Oliver [D] |
Rep. Stacey Evans [D] | Rep. Stephen Allison [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-04 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2016-02-03 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-02 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-01 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/47967 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20152016/156091 |