GA HB879 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-18 - Effective Date 2022-04-18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-18 - Effective Date 2022-04-18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act establishing a civil service system for the employees of Clayton County, approved March 29, 1994 (Ga. L. 1994, p. 4399), as amended, so as to exclude additional employee positions from such civil service system; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Clayton County; civil service system; exclude additional employee positions
Sponsors
Rep. Rhonda Burnough [D] | Rep. Sandra Scott [D] | Rep. Kim Schofield [D] | Rep. Debra Bazemore [D] |
Rep. Demetrius Douglas [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-11 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #501 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - Local Calendar Without Hb881 & Hb890: House Vote #451 (Y: 153 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - Local Calendar Without Hb881 & Hb890: House Vote #451 (Y: 153 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-18 | Effective Date 2022-04-18 | |
2022-04-18 | Act 607 | |
2022-04-18 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-01-24 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-01-24 | House | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate |
2022-01-24 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-01-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-01-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-01-13 | House | House First Readers |
2022-01-12 | House | House Hopper |