GA HB872 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to authorize the Magistrate Court of Clayton County to impose and collect county law library fees as part of the court costs in the magistrate court; to provide for practices and procedures connected therewith; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Clayton County; Magistrate Court; impose and collect county law library fees
Sponsors
Rep. Rhonda Burnough [D] | Rep. Mike Glanton [D] | Rep. Sandra Scott [D] | Rep. Valencia Stovall [D] |
Rep. Kim Schofield [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - House - House Vote #460 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-19 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-02-19 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-02-19 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-04 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-03 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/57152 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/189246 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/57152#17383 |