GA HB870 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-11 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Education and Youth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 14 of Article 6 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to certain programs and activities under the "Quality Basic Education Act," so as to provide that high schools that receive state funding cannot participate in an athletic association which prohibits religious expression on the clothing of student athletes; to provide that high schools that receive state funding cannot participate in an athletic association which prohibits member schools from organizing and playing scrimmage matches, games, or other athletic competitions with nonmember schools; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Quality Basic Education Act; high schools that receive state funding cannot participate in an athletic association which prohibits religious expression on clothing of student athletes; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-10 - House - House Vote #518 (Y: 136 N: 25 NV: 5 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-11SenateSenate Read and Referred
2016-02-10HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2016-02-10HouseHouse Third Readers
2016-02-09HouseHouse Postponed
2016-02-04HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2016-02-02HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2016-02-02HouseHouse Second Readers
2016-02-01HouseHouse First Readers
2016-01-28HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback