GA HB867 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 5 of Chapter 36 of Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to limitation on annexation of areas furnished services or included in comprehensive zoning plan by certain counties, so as to prohibit annexations of county operated airport property by governing authorities of certain municipal corporations absent approval by the governing authority of the county operating the airport; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Local government; county operated airport property; provisions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-03 | House | House First Readers |
2020-01-31 | House | House Hopper |