GA HB859 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Veto V9
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Veto V9
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 3 of Article 4 of Chapter 11 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to carrying and possession of firearms, so as to authorize the carrying and possession of certain weapons by weapons carry license holders in or on certain buildings or real property owned by or leased to public institutions of postsecondary education; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Firearms; license holders; carrying and possession of certain weapons in certain buildings or real property owned or leased to public institutions of postsecondary education; authorize
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Jasperse [R] | Rep. Mandi Ballinger [R] | Rep. John Meadows [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] |
Rep. Dustin Hightower [R] | Rep. Trey Kelley [R] | Sen. Jesse Stone [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-11 - Senate - Senate Vote #577 (Y: 34 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - Senate - Senate Vote #584 (Y: 37 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House Vote #579 (Y: 113 N: 59 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - Senate - Senate Vote #584 (Y: 37 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House Vote #579 (Y: 113 N: 59 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-03 | Veto V9 | |
2016-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-28 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-17 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-02-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-01-28 | House | House First Readers |
2016-01-27 | House | House Hopper |