GA HB859 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 42-8-36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the duty of probationer to inform probation supervisor of residence and whereabouts and violations, so as to clarify provisions relating to tolling of probated sentences when a probationer fails to report to probation or otherwise absconds; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Probationer duties; tolling of probated sentences; clarify provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Rich Golick [R] | Sen. Johnny Grant [R] | Sen. Ed Setzler [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #677 - Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - House - House Vote #558 - Pass (Y: 159 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - House - House Vote #558 - Pass (Y: 159 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2010-05-27 | Act 496 | |
2010-05-27 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-03 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-03-30 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-30 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-03-11 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-03-10 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-02-09 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2010-02-08 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-02-08 | House Third Readers | |
2010-01-26 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-01-11 | House Second Readers | |
2009-04-03 | House First Readers |