GA HB856 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to establish a system of public schools for the City of Valdosta, approved December 20, 1893 (Ga. L. 1893, p. 453), as amended, particularly by an Act approved August 22, 1907 (Ga. L. 1907, p. 957) and an Act approved May 4, 1992 (Ga. L. 1992, p. 6809), so as to modify the compensation of the members of the Board of Education of the City of Valdosta, Georgia; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Valdosta, City of; Board of Education; modify compensation of members
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-01-31 | House | House First Readers |
2020-01-30 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/57038 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/188924 |